NH SB550 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to utility requirements for integrated distribution planning.
Title
Relative to utility requirements for integrated distribution planning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |