NH SB546 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 203-121 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 203-121 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to petitions for verification of checklists.
Title
Relative to petitions for verification of checklists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 203-121 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 41 |
2016-04-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study House Calendar 24 P. 17 |
2016-04-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/20/2016 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 17 |
2016-03-30 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 11:40 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing: 02/10/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3 |