NH SB544 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Executive Session: 05/07/2024 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Fish and Game and Marine Resources Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:20 am in Legislative Office Building 307
Hearing: May 7 @ 11:45 am in Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Executive Session: 05/07/2024 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Fish and Game and Marine Resources Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:20 am in Legislative Office Building 307
Hearing: May 7 @ 11:45 am in Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replacing the deer seal system with a confirmation number system.
Title
Replacing the deer seal system with a confirmation number system.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 05/07/2024 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 05/07/2024 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |