NH SB53 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the interagency coordinating council for women offenders and relative to the membership of the interbranch criminal and juvenile justice council.
Title
Repealing the interagency coordinating council for women offenders and relative to the membership of the interbranch criminal and juvenile justice council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/11/2015 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1213h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1213h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1576 |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment #1213h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1576 |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1213h (NT) for Apr 29 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1482 |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-03-25 | House | Vacated and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 28, PG. 1289 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0498s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0498s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0498s, New Title, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/3/15, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |