NH SB523 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - III. Remainder Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - III. Remainder Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program and establishing a commission to study requiring controlled drugs and controlled drug analogs to be provided in abuse-deterrent formulation.
Title
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program and establishing a commission to study requiring controlled drugs and controlled drug analogs to be provided in abuse-deterrent formulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 232 N: 106 NV: 30 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 01/01/2017 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | II. Sections 2 and 4 Effective 06/21/2016 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | I. Section 3 Effective 11/01/2016 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0309 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2148e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 63 |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2148e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2005c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 232-106 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 31 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2005c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-25 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-2005c Filed 05/25/2016; As Amended by the House |
2016-05-20 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Snow Replaces Rep. Sherman 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 30 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/23/2016, 09:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Kotowski, LeBrun, Freitas, Sherman 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 18 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Sanborn, Soucy; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1313h, New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; 05/19/2016 Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1313h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 102 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1313h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 101 |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1313h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 24 |
2016-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/05/2016 08:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0852s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0852s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/10/2016 Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0852s, New Title, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing: 02/09/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3 |