NH SB504 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Pending Motion Interim Study; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Pending Motion Interim Study; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to hunting and fishing licenses for disabled veterans.
Title
Relative to hunting and fishing licenses for disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Russell Ober [R] |
Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Peggy McCarthy [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Pending Motion Interim Study; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing: 02/10/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/14/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |