NH SB499 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/1/2010; Effective 07/1/2010; Chapter 0118
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/1/2010; Effective 07/1/2010; Chapter 0118
Summary
Relative to administration support of certain professional regulatory boards by the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to administration support of certain professional regulatory boards by the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Betsi DeVries [D] | Sen. Michael Downing [R] |
Rep. Valerie Hardy [D] | Rep. Anne-Marie Irwin [D] | Rep. Sharon Nordgren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/1/2010; Effective 07/1/2010; Chapter 0118 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1678 Adopted | |
2010-04-28 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #1678 Adopted; House Journal 36, PG.1730 | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1657 | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 21 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1526 | |
2010-04-06 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-03-30 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-03-11 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 25, PG.1297 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.117 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0829s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.107 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment 0829s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.107 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0829s, 3/3/10; Senate Calendar 9, Pg.20 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Hearing: February 16, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4, Pg.60 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2934&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |