NH SB498 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0307; Effective 08/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to penalties for possession of certain controlled drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to penalties for possession of certain controlled drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 289 N: 58 NV: 19 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-22SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0307; Effective 08/20/2016
2016-06-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20
2016-06-15HouseEnrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66
2016-06-01SenateConference Committee Report 2032c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19
2016-06-01HouseConference Committee Report 2032c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 29
2016-05-25HouseConference Committee Report #2016-2032c Filed 05/25/2016; New Amendment
2016-05-24SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 05/24/2016, 10:00 a.m., Room 100, State House
2016-05-19HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Welch, DiSesa, Barnes, Cushing 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17
2016-05-19HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17
2016-05-19SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Forrester, Hosmer; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18
2016-05-19SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1587h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18
2016-05-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1587h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 289-58 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 54
2016-05-11HouseAmendment #2016-1587h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 51
2016-05-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1587h for 05/11/2016 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 18
2016-04-20HouseExecutive Session: 04/26/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-04-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/19/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-04-06HouseRecommit (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 19
2016-04-06HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Sylvia) 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 4
2016-03-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/06/2016 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 6
2016-03-30HouseExecutive Session: 03/29/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2016-03-22HousePublic Hearing: 03/29/2016 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-03-15HouseIntroduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 25 P. 118
2016-03-03SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7
2016-02-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7
2016-01-27SenateHearing: 02/02/2016, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 4
2016-01-07SenateIntroduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback