NH SB495 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain court orders in a divorce/custody matter.
Title
Relative to certain court orders in a divorce/custody matter.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Philip Bean [R] |
Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |