NH SB492 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/24/2024 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/24/2024 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wastewater engineering.
Title
Relative to wastewater engineering.
Sponsors
Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Thomas Buco [D] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/24/2024 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) |
2024-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0557s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0557s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0557s, 02/15/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |