NH SB487 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 11, Pg.240
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 11, Pg.240
Summary
Relative to charter limitations on the growth of budgets and taxes and to the validity of certain city and town charter provisions.
Title
Relative to charter limitations on the growth of budgets and taxes and to the validity of certain city and town charter provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Michael Downing [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Robert Letourneau [R] | Sen. Sheila Roberge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 11, Pg.240 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order forward; Senate Journal 11, Pg.240 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Hearing: March 4, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3, Pg.46 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2886&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |