NH SB48 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0263; Effective 09/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0263; Effective 09/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school performance and accountability.
Title
Relative to school performance and accountability.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0263; Effective 09/22/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2077c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2077c Adopted, Regular Calendar 205-143; House Journal 52, PG.1671-1674 |
2013-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Report #2013-2077c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar47, PG.1537 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/17/2013, 9:00 a.m., Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2013-06-13 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Ladd, Frazer, Shaw, and Gile [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1653 |
2013-06-13 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1653 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Reagan, Kelly |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1641; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep Kurk): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 300-32; House Journal 49, PG.1600-1606 |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1641h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-134; House Journal 49, PG.1596-1600 |
2013-06-05 | House | Lay on the Table (Rep Boehm): Motion Failed Division Vote 135-189; House Journal 49, PG.1598 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1641h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1596-1598 |
2013-05-21 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1641h; House Calendar42, PG.1445-1447 |
2013-05-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1641h for June 5 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1432 |
2013-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 5/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/9/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/1/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0465s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0465s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0465s, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |