NH SB467 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 9, Pg.147
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 9, Pg.147
Summary
Establishing job creation incentives under the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax.
Title
Establishing job creation incentives under the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Senate Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 9, Pg.147 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Ought to Pass, Not Voted On | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 3/10/10; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Hearing: February 2, 2010, Room 100, State House, 11:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 2, Pg.30 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2684&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |