NH SB465 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 01:40 pm Legislative Office Building 203
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 01:40 pm Legislative Office Building 203
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to motorist duties when approaching highway emergencies involving a stopped or standing vehicle.
Title
Relative to motorist duties when approaching highway emergencies involving a stopped or standing vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Rep. Dru Fox [D] | Rep. Catherine Rombeau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 01:40 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 6 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0113s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0113s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0113s, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |