NH SB465 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - House House Refuses to Accede to Req for C of C (Rep M.Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-118; House Journal 46, PG.2231-2233
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - House House Refuses to Accede to Req for C of C (Rep M.Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-118; House Journal 46, PG.2231-2233
Summary
Relative to the transition period for implementing the adequacy aid formula.
Title
Relative to the transition period for implementing the adequacy aid formula.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | House House Refuses to Accede to Req for C of C (Rep M.Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-118; House Journal 46, PG.2231-2233 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Kelly, Janeway and Odell; Senate Journal 19, Pg.632 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1636h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg | |
2010-05-05 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1636h(NT): Motion Adopted Division Vote 199-141; House Journal 38, PG.1908-1912 | |
2010-05-05 | House Floor Amendment #1838h(NT) (Rep Belvin) Failed, Regular Calendar 131-208; House Journal 38, PG.1909-1912 | |
2010-05-05 | House Amendment #1636h (New Title) Adopted, Division Vote 195-144; House Journal 38, PG.1908-1909 | |
2010-04-29 | House Proposed Minority Committee Amendment #1747h (New Title); House Calendar 34, PG.1650-1651 | |
2010-04-29 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1747h(NT); House Calendar 34, PG.1626-1627 | |
2010-04-29 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #1636h (New Title); House Calendar 34, PG.1650 | |
2010-04-29 | House Majority Com Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1636h(NT) for May 5 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 34, PG.1626-1627 | |
2010-04-26 | House Executive Session: 4/27/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-26 | House Division II Work Session Continued: 4/27/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-22 | House Division II Work Session: 4/26/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==RECESSED== | |
2010-04-14 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/22/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/13/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 30, PG.1521 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading ResolutionSJ 11, Pg.256 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1131s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.224 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Amendment 1131s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.224 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1131s, 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Hearing: February 4, 2010, Room 100, State House, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2, Pg.30 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2809&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |