NH SB46 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1597
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1597
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extending and revising the commission to develop a plan for the expansion of transmission capacity in the north country.
Title
Extending and revising the commission to develop a plan for the expansion of transmission capacity in the north country.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] |
Rep. William Remick [R] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1597 | |
2011-05-18 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 25 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 41, PG.1395 | |
2011-05-04 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-05-04 | House Public Hearing: 5/17/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0517s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.88 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment 0517s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.88 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0517s, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |