NH SB453 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the statewide voter registration system.
Title
Making an appropriation to the statewide voter registration system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 85 |
2024-05-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-05-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 05/16/2024 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 21 |
2024-05-14 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/14/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/13/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | Division I Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Finance House Journal 7 P. 110 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0795s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0795s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0795s, 03/07/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:10 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |