NH SB452 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to renewable energy fund incentive payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to renewable energy fund incentive payments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/02/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 8
2018-04-25HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-03-28House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2018-03-27HouseIntroduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 10 P. 53
2018-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13
2018-01-16SenateHearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback