NH SB451 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.114
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.114
Summary
Including low digit number plates as vanity plates.
Title
Including low digit number plates as vanity plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.114 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 3/3/10; Senate Calendar 8 | |
2010-01-20 | Senate Hearing; January 28, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m. Senate Calendar 4 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation & Interstate Cooperation; Senate Journal 1, Pg.16 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2708&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |