NH SB450 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House Finance, Full Committee Work Session: 4/29/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House Finance, Full Committee Work Session: 4/29/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
Summary
Relative to costs and expenditures at the department of health and human services, establishing a special fund for certain civil fines collected by the department, and relative to the due date for the Medicaid enhancement tax.
Title
Relative to costs and expenditures at the department of health and human services, establishing a special fund for certain civil fines collected by the department, and relative to the due date for the Medicaid enhancement tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | House Finance, Full Committee Work Session: 4/29/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Committee Work Session: 4/29/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 Proposed Amendments | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Committee Work Session: 4/27/2010 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 Proposed Amendment Continued from 4/26 | |
2010-04-15 | House Finance, Div I Subcom Work Session: 4/27/2010 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 Mtg with DES, Budget Cuts Discussion | |
2010-04-15 | House Public Works, Full Committee Work Session: 4/27/2010 11:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 Proposed Amendment Sec.82 & 83-85 | |
2010-04-15 | House Finance, Full Committee Work Session: 4/27/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==TIME CHANGE== | |
2010-04-15 | House Potentially Adding Capital Gains to the Interest and Dividends Tax and Increasing the Exemption | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2010 4:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Comm Work Sess: 4/26/2010 3:45 PM Legislative Office Building 202 on Potential Insurance Premium Tax | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Comm Work Session: 4/26/2010 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 Proposed Amendment Sec.88 Dedicated Funds | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Comm Work Sess: 4/26/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 Proposed Amendment Sec.99 Pet Shop License Fee | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Comm Work Sess: 4/26/2010 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building202 Proposed Amendment1401h Electric Generation Tax | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Comm Work Session: 4/26/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 on Potential Nuclear Fuel Tax | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Full Comm Work Session: 4/26/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 Proposed Amendment Sec.86-97 Tobacco Tax | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Subcommittee Work Session: 4/23/2010 Legislative Office Building202 1:30 PM Proposed Amendment Sec.86-87 Tobacco Tax | |
2010-04-15 | House Ways & Means, Subcommittee Work Session: 4/23/2010 Legislative Office Building202 1:00 PM Proposed Amendment Sec.97 Bus Tax Comm | |
2010-04-15 | House 4:00 PM Office of Information Technology | |
2010-04-15 | House 3:30 PM Dept of Education | |
2010-04-15 | House 3:00 PM Office of Energy & Planning | |
2010-04-15 | House 2:30 PM Dept Resources & Economic Development | |
2010-04-15 | House 2:00 PM Treasurer | |
2010-04-15 | House 1:00 PM Dept of Administrative Services | |
2010-04-15 | House Finance, Full Committee Work Session: 4/22/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 Including the Following: | |
2010-04-14 | House Ways & Means, Public Hearing on Proposed Amendment, Sec.99: 4/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-04-14 | House Public Works & Highways, Public Hearing, Proposed Amendment, Sec.82 & Sec.83-85: 4/20/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-04-14 | House Speaker Assigns Proposed Amendment #1311h: Ways & Means Sec.86-88, 92-97, & 99; House Journal 32, PG.1578 | |
2010-04-14 | House Speaker Assigns Proposed Amendment #1311h: Public Works & Highways Sec.82-85; House Journal 32, PG.1578 | |
2010-04-14 | House Finance, Full Committee Work Session - Judicial Branch: 4/20/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-14 | House Finance, Full Committee Work Session - Dept of Corrections: 4/20/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-14 | House Finance, Full Committee Work Session - Dept. of Environmental Services: 4/20/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-21 | |
2010-04-14 | House Finance, Full Committee Work Session - Dept of Health & Human Svcs: 4/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-08 | House Public Hearing on Proposed Amendment: 4/15/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 (AM Available 4/12 Sgt-at-Arms) | |
2010-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/15/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 Joint with Senate Finance | |
2010-04-01 | House Amendment #1676h (Rep Kurk): Special Assessments; Banking; Insurance; Utilities | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 30, PG.1519 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.256 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 1113s, New Title, 1174s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.223 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Sen. Sgambati Floor Amendment 1174s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.223 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Amendment 1113s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.223 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1113s, New Title, 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Hearing: March 11, 2010, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2, Pg.29 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2705&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |