NH SB447 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 186-146; House Journal 36, PG.1718-1719
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 186-146; House Journal 36, PG.1718-1719
Summary
Relative to the residence requirement for assistant town moderators and assistant town clerks.
Title
Relative to the residence requirement for assistant town moderators and assistant town clerks.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Brown [D] | Rep. Mary Cooney [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Betsey Patten [R] |
Sen. Sheila Roberge [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 186-146; House Journal 36, PG.1718-1719 | |
2010-04-21 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 33, PG.1596-1597 | |
2010-04-21 | House Majority Comm Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for April 28 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1596-1597 | |
2010-04-01 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-04-01 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/6/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 3/30/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 26, PG.1392 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.150 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0904s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment 0904s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0904s, New Title, 3/10/10; Senate Calendar 10, Pg.17 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Hearing: February 18, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 8:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.16 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2915&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |