NH SB445 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a voter-owned elections fund for eligible candidates to executive councilor and making an appropriation to the fund.
Title
Establishing a voter-owned elections fund for eligible candidates to executive councilor and making an appropriation to the fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Russell Muirhead [D] |
Rep. Heath Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/08/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |