NH SB444 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 06/17/2010; Chapter 0166
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 06/17/2010; Chapter 0166
Summary
Relative to the medical child support obligation.
Title
Relative to the medical child support obligation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 06/17/2010; Chapter 0166 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-04-28 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG.1699 | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 28 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1592 | |
2010-04-08 | House Executive Session: 4/15/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2010-04-07 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/13/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2010-03-18 | House Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 27, PG.1441 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0963s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment 0963s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.168 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0963s, 3/17/10; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Hearing: February 2, 2010, Room 103, State House, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1, Pg.16 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2885&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |