NH SB442 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0178; Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0178; Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the suspension of a vehicle registration as a result of evading toll collection systems.
Title
Relative to the suspension of a vehicle registration as a result of evading toll collection systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 201 N: 103 NV: 40 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTP (Y: 218 N: 94 NV: 37 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTP (Y: 218 N: 94 NV: 37 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0178; Effective 01/01/2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-94 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/26/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-94 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 20 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 09:20 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 09:20 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Transportation |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1194s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1194s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1194s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0639s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0639s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0639s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |