NH SB442 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2010; Effective 09/18/2010; Chapter 0352
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2010; Effective 09/18/2010; Chapter 0352
Summary
Relative to the grant program to administer exotic aquatic plant prevention.
Title
Relative to the grant program to administer exotic aquatic plant prevention.
Sponsors
Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] | Rep. Anthony DiFruscia [R] | Rep. Barbara French [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
Rep. Alida Millham [R] | Sen. Deborah Reynolds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2010; Effective 09/18/2010; Chapter 0352 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2234; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-06-02 | House Conference Committee Report #2234 Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-27 | House Conference Committee Report #2234, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 43, PG.2159 | |
2010-05-21 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/25/2010 3:40 p.m., Room 103, State House | |
2010-05-19 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Almy, Mack, Osgood & Tupper; House Journal 46, PG.2241 | |
2010-05-19 | House House Accedes to Request for Comm of Conf (Rep Hess): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2241 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Merrill, Odell and Lasky; Senate Journal 20, Pg.646 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. Fuller Clark Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1692h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-05 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1692h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1894-1895 | |
2010-05-05 | House Amendment #1692h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1894-1895 | |
2010-04-29 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #1692h; House Calendar 34, PG.1649-1650 | |
2010-04-29 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1692h for May 5 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34, PG.1625 | |
2010-04-28 | House Executive Session: 4/28/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-04-22 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/27/2010 1:20 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-04-21 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 35, PG.1660 | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1660 | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 21 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1529 | |
2010-04-07 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-03-31 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 (Orig 1:00 PM) | |
2010-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 26, PG.1392 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.150 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0908s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.134 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment 0908s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.134 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0908s, 3/10/10; Senate Calendar 10, Pg.17 | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Hearing; January 20, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy, Environment and Economic Development; Senate Journal 1, Pg.16 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2871&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |