NH SB410 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseVacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 59
2020-01-30SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4
2020-01-09SenateHearing: 01/14/2020, Room 100, State House, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 2
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback