NH SB408 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding for the children's savings account program.
Title
Relative to funding for the children's savings account program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 103, State House, 02:25 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |