NH SB407 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0164
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0164
Summary
Relative to records maintained by the department of health and human services in abuse and neglect cases.
Title
Relative to records maintained by the department of health and human services in abuse and neglect cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Brown [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Sen. Deborah Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Barbara Richardson [D] | Sen. Kathleen Sgambati [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0164 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-04-28 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG.1699 | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 28 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1592 | |
2010-03-31 | House Executive Session: 4/15/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2010-03-16 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 18, PG.1017 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 5, Pg.65 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 5, Pg.63 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 2/3/10; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate Hearing; January 26, 2010, Room 103, State House, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.9 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2728&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |