NH SB396 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0097; Effective 07/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0097; Effective 07/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to solid waste management.
Title
Relative to solid waste management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2022; Chapter 0097; Effective 07/19/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-25 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2022-04-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/12/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2022-0810s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8A |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0659s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0659s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0659s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |