NH SB395 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to records under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to access to records under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 7 |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/19/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 6 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1010s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1010s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1010s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |