NH SB394 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0230; Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0230; Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of a child with a disability under special education laws and providing funding for special education costs for students over age 21 to age 22.
Title
Relative to the definition of a child with a disability under special education laws and providing funding for special education costs for students over age 21 to age 22.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0230; Effective 06/17/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Ward Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1770h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1770h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1770h(NT) (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/22/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1538h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 1538h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1538h(NT) (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7 |
2022-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/13/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Education |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0590s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0590s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0590s, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |