NH SB39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB39
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting information and records contained in law enforcement personnel files from disclosure under the right-to-know law.
Title
Exempting information and records contained in law enforcement personnel files from disclosure under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/19/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB39 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8