NH SB38 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to extensions for wetland and shoreland permits.
Title
Relative to extensions for wetland and shoreland permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0143 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1536-1537 | |
2011-05-04 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1321 | |
2011-04-26 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 7, Pg.77 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.68 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/23/11; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Hearing: 2/17/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.32 |