NH SB376 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 08/23/2010; Effective 08/23/2010; Chapter 0381
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 08/23/2010; Effective 08/23/2010; Chapter 0381
Summary
Naming a bridge in honor of Joseph Sawtelle.
Title
Naming a bridge in honor of Joseph Sawtelle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 08/23/2010; Effective 08/23/2010; Chapter 0381 | |
2010-04-21 | House Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1671 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 15, Pg.331 | |
2010-04-14 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1586 | |
2010-04-06 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 14 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG.1459 | |
2010-03-23 | House Executive Session: 4/6/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 4/1/2010 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 18, PG.1016 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 3, Pg 44 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0156s, New Title, Regular Calendar 23Y - 0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 3, Pg.42 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 0156s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 3, Pg.42 | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass with Amendment 0156s, New Title, 1/21/10; Senate Calendar 3 Pg.5 | |
2010-01-07 | Senate Hearing: January 14, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Transportation and Interstate Cooperation Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.8 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2783&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |