NH SB374 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2012; Chapter 0048; Effective 07/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2012; Chapter 0048; Effective 07/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Naming marine patrol headquarters in honor of David Barrett.
Title
Naming marine patrol headquarters in honor of David Barrett.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/14/2012; Chapter 0048; Effective 07/13/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 13, Pg.475 | |
2012-04-25 | House Enrolled | |
2012-04-25 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2177 | |
2012-04-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 25 (Vote 10-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1926 | |
2012-03-20 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 15, PG.907 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4, Pg.117 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/8/12; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Hearing: 2/2/12, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |