NH SB364 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to group II service retirement allowances and relative to establishing a supplemental savings plan in the retirement system.
Title
Relative to group II service retirement allowances and relative to establishing a supplemental savings plan in the retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/12/14, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |