NH SB364 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 05/18/2010; Chapter 0042
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 05/18/2010; Chapter 0042
Summary
Recognizing Canadian boating safety education certificates.
Title
Recognizing Canadian boating safety education certificates.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Jennifer Coffey [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] |
Sen. Robert Letourneau [R] | Rep. Stephen Nedeau [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 05/18/2010; Chapter 0042 | |
2010-04-28 | House Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG.1729 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1582 | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 14 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG.1457 | |
2010-03-16 | House Executive Session: 3/23/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-03-03 | House Public Hearing: 3/16/2010 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 18, PG.1016 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 3, Pg.44 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0155s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 3, Pg.42 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 0155s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass with Amendment 0155s, 1/21/10; Senate Calendar 3 Pg.5 | |
2010-01-07 | Senate Hearing: January 14, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:05 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Transportation and Interstate Cooperation Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.7 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2696&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |