NH SB363 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/26/2010; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0107
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/26/2010; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0107
Summary
Requiring the suspension of boating privileges for refusing a blood alcohol test.
Title
Requiring the suspension of boating privileges for refusing a blood alcohol test.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Sen. Robert Letourneau [R] |
Rep. Stephen Nedeau [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/26/2010; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0107 | |
2010-04-21 | House Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1671 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1582 | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 14 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG.1457 | |
2010-03-16 | House Executive Session: 3/23/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-03-03 | House Public Hearing: 3/16/2010 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 18, PG.1017 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 6, Pg.77 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.75 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 2/10/10; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2010-01-07 | Senate Hearing: January 12, 2010, Room 103, State House, 3:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1, Pg.7 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2691&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |