NH SB361 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - II. Remainder Effective 08/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - II. Remainder Effective 08/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the licensing requirements for mortgage bankers and brokers.
Title
Relative to the licensing requirements for mortgage bankers and brokers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 08/15/14 |
2014-06-27 | Senate | I. Section 4 Effective 01/01/15 |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0145 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-30 | House | Reconsideration Third Reading (Rep Lambert) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202 |
2014-04-30 | House | Third Reading Motion Adopted Div, 184-155 |
2014-04-30 | House | Ought to Pass: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/22/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0635s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0635s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0635s, New Title, 3/6/14; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/18/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |