NH SB358 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2012; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/20/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2012; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/20/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for free admission to the state park system for members of the armed forces.
Title
Relative to eligibility for free admission to the state park system for members of the armed forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2012; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/20/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Morse Concurs with House Amendment #1929h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-09 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1929h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2235-2236 | |
2012-05-09 | House Amendment #1929h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2235-2236 | |
2012-05-02 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-1929h (New Title); House Calendar 36, PG.2027 | |
2012-05-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1929h(NT) for May 9 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.2010 | |
2012-04-24 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2012 11:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-04-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/17/2012 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-03-28 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/3/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-03-21 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/27/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-03-07 | House Public Hearing: 3/12/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 15, PG.907 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0427s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4, Pg.108 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Amendment 0427s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4, Pg.108 | |
2012-01-27 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0427s, 2/8/12; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Hearing: === RECONVENE === 1/19/12, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Hearing: === RECESSED === 1/5/12, Room 103, State House, 1:15 p.m. | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Hearing: 1/5/12, Room 103, State House, 1:15 p.m; Senate Calendar 1 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1, Pg.13 |