NH SB357 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mental health training for first responders.
Title
Relative to mental health training for first responders.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] |
Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Rep. Stephen Pearson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1625h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1625h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1625h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |