NH SB350 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0247; Effective 09/19/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the transfer of adequacy aid estimates from the department of education to the department of revenue administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the transfer of adequacy aid estimates from the department of education to the department of revenue administration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-23SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0247; Effective 09/19/2014
2014-05-22HouseEnrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014)
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled
2014-05-08SenateSen. Stiles Concurs with House Amendment #1337h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2014-04-30HouseReconsideration Third Reading (Rep Lambert) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202
2014-04-30HouseThird Reading Motion Adopted Div, 184-155
2014-04-30HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1337h, New Title, Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-30HouseAmendment #2014-1337h, (New Title), Amendment Adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1337h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32
2014-04-15HouseExecutive Session: 4/22/14 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2014-03-18HousePublic Hearing: 4/10/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2014-03-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to Education
2014-02-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0503s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2014-02-19SenateCommittee Amendment 0503s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2014-02-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0503s, New Title, 2/19/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7
2014-01-16SenateHearing: 1/21/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3
2014-01-07SenateIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback