NH SB348 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0190; Effective 08/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0190; Effective 08/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the pulse oximetry test for newborns.
Title
Relative to the pulse oximetry test for newborns.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - FLAM 2303H(NT) (REP WILLETTE) (Y: 95 N: 183 NV: 44 Abs: 75) [FAIL]
2012-05-17 - House - FLAM 2303H(NT) (REP WILLETTE) (Y: 137 N: 133 NV: 52 Abs: 75) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - FLAM 2303H(NT) (REP WILLETTE) (Y: 137 N: 133 NV: 52 Abs: 75) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0190; Effective 08/10/2012 | |
2012-06-05 | Senate Enrolled (05/23/12) | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled; House Journal 47, PG.2508 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Bradley Concurs with House Amendment #1568h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-17 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 213-67; House Journal 46, PG.2441-2448 | |
2012-05-17 | House Floor Amendment #2303h(NT) (Rep Willette): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 95-183; House Journal 46, PG.2446-2448 | |
2012-05-17 | House Reconsideration (Rep Blankenbeker): Motion Adopted Division Vote 184-94; House Journal 46, PG.2446 | |
2012-05-17 | House Floor Amendment #2012-2303h(NT) (Rep Willette): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 137-133; House Journal 46, PG.2441-2446 | |
2012-05-16 | House Special Order to First Order of Business Next Session: Without Objection; House Journal 44, PG.2429 | |
2012-05-16 | House Special Order to End of Today's Calendar: Without Objection; House Journal 44, PG.2348 | |
2012-05-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 37, PG.2043 | |
2012-05-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 15 (Vote 17-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2043 | |
2012-05-01 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-05-01 | House Division III Work Session: 5/8/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 | |
2012-04-11 | House Referred to Finance | |
2012-04-11 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1568h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-11 | House Floor Amendment #2012-1568h (Rep Blankenbeker): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-11 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell) | |
2012-04-04 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 11 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG.1722 | |
2012-03-19 | House Executive Session: 3/27/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-03-06 | House Public Hearing: 3/12/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-02-22 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 20, PG.1251 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5, Pg.134 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/15/12; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0420s, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 4, Pg.105 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Amendment 0420s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4, Pg.105 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0420s, 2/8/12 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Special Ordered to the beginning of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 4, Pg.104 | |
2012-01-27 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0420s, 2/8/12; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-05 | Senate Hearing: 1/19/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1, Pg.12 |