NH SB344 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 176-155 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 176-155 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the electronic participation requirements of meetings open to the public under the right to know law.
Title
Relative to the electronic participation requirements of meetings open to the public under the right to know law.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] |
Rep. Patrick Long [D] | Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] | Rep. Timothy Egan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - ITL (Y: 176 N: 155 NV: 22 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 176-155 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/13/2022 11:15 am State House Reps Hall |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1301s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Perkins Kwoka Floor Amendment # 2022-1301s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Withdraws Floor Amendment #2022-1135s; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Pending Motion: Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2022-1135s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Pending Motion: Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2022-1135s, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2022-1135s; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved Ought to Pass; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/17/2022; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Special Order to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-15 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |