NH SB336 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0213; Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the judicial district for the town of Waterville Valley and the unincorporated place of Livermore.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the judicial district for the town of Waterville Valley and the unincorporated place of Livermore.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0213; Effective 07/01/2018
2018-05-23HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-22SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1951e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1951e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018;
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1133h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5
2018-04-05HouseAmendment # 2018-1133h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1133h (NT) for 04/05/2018 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5
2018-03-21HouseExecutive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-01-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0063s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0063s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0063s, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3
2017-12-14SenateHearing: 01/09/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 48
2017-12-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback