NH SB336 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the taking of deer from baited areas on state-owned lands.
Title
Prohibiting the taking of deer from baited areas on state-owned lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - House - ITL (Y: 200 N: 85 NV: 49 Abs: 53) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-85 |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 5/7/2014 12:00 PM or at session lunch break Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-15 | House | ==REVISED== Public Hearing: 4/22/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/22/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/2014, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |