NH SB331 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0195; Effective 06/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0195; Effective 06/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the definition of surviving spouse for eligibility for line-of-duty death benefits for police officers or firefighters killed in the line of duty, and making an appropriation for a shortfall in an individual medical subsidy payment.
Title
Clarifying the definition of surviving spouse for eligibility for line-of-duty death benefits for police officers or firefighters killed in the line of duty, and making an appropriation for a shortfall in an individual medical subsidy payment.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Ken Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Sen. James Rausch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0195; Effective 06/11/2012 | |
2012-06-05 | Senate Enrolled (05/23/12) | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled; House Journal 47, PG.2508 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #2019h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2019h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2286 | |
2012-05-15 | House Amendment #2019h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2286 | |
2012-05-08 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-2019h (New Title); House Calendar 37, PG.2100-2101 | |
2012-05-08 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2019h(NT) for May 15 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2032 | |
2012-04-20 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-20 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/2/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-03-29 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/3/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-03-06 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-22 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 20, PG.1251 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5, Pg.132 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/15/12; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-01-05 | Senate Hearing: 1/19/12, Room 100, State House, 10:25 a.m; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1, Pg.11 |