NH SB325 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0166; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0166; Effective 08/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to local organization for emergency management and first responders.
Title
Relative to local organization for emergency management and first responders.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Thomas Buco [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 248 N: 84 NV: 17 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0166; Effective 08/06/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-84 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0705s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0705s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0705s, 02/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2021-12-15 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |