NH SB322 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0045; Effective 07/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the provision and administration of bronchodilators, spacers, and nebulizers in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the provision and administration of bronchodilators, spacers, and nebulizers in schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0045; Effective 07/02/2016
2016-04-21SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/21/2016); Senate Journal 15
2016-04-26HouseEnrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 51
2016-04-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 4
2016-03-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/06/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 7
2016-03-17HouseExecutive Session: 03/17/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2016-03-08HousePublic Hearing: 03/17/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2016-02-16HouseIntroduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 17 P. 50
2016-02-04SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0098s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4
2016-02-04SenateCommittee Amendment 0098s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/04/2016
2016-01-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0098s, 02/04/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4
2016-01-06SenateHearing: 01/19/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 1
2015-12-29SenateTo Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback