NH SB317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0164; Effective 04/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0164; Effective 04/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the interest rate for abatements of paid property taxes.
Title
Reducing the interest rate for abatements of paid property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0164; Effective 04/01/2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0173s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0173s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0173s, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |